Financial history SENNEN AND LANDS END PRESCHOOL

Charity Number: 1036652
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £38.63k £54.02k £29.62k £36.13k £45.50k
Total expenditure £38.36k £38.28k £41.67k £40.23k £39.24k
Income from government contracts £29.07k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £48.36k £24.91k £24.76k £27.94k