Financial history WELTON SCHOOL PLAYGROUP

Charity number: 1036658
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £76.44k £90.50k £89.00k £76.36k £75.00k
Total expenditure £74.90k £91.50k £87.00k £79.13k £101.00k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A