BELLINGHAM COMMUNITY PROJECT LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Within the London Borough of Lewisham and the surrounding boroughs, to develop the capacity and skills of the inhabitants to help meet their own needs and to work with voluntary and community groups to provide facilities for sport and recreation or other leisure time occupation in the interests of social welfare with the object of improving their conditions of life.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £18,750 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Lewisham
Governance
- 18 April 1994: Standard registration
- BELLINGHAM PLAYING FIELDS LIMITED (Previous name)
- THE BELLINGHAM RECREATION PROJECT LIMITED (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
COUNCILLOR PETER BROOKS | Chair | 29 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Alina Tuerk | Trustee | 18 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Iyare Gamal Abdel Noser Igiehon | Trustee | 29 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ami Frances Ibitson | Trustee | 17 September 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £120.67k | £211.54k | £156.06k | £143.73k | £192.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £194.01k | £200.96k | £188.81k | £199.33k | £226.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £43.36k | £38.20k | £27.46k | £25.00k | £18.75k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 06 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 03 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 14/12/1992 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 31/03/1993 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17/02/1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30/07/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21/04/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15/11/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01/07/2011
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT PRINCIPALLY OF PEOPLE IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF LEWISHAM AND THE SURROUNDING BOROUGHS WITHIN LONDON (THE AREA OF BENEFIT), THAT WILL DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF THE INHABITANTS IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY AND HELP MEET THEIR NEEDS. (B) TO WORK AND SUPPORT VOLUNTARY AND COMMUNITY GROUPS IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR SPORT AND RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF LEWISHAM AND THE SURROUNDING BOROUGHS WITHIN LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
BELLINGHAM COMMUNITY PROJECT
4-7 CHISWELL STREET
LONDON
EC1Y 4UP
- Phone:
- 02076066145
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window