Financial history Muskham Preschool

Charity number: 1036670
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £77.49k £98.35k £92.66k £106.64k £76.17k
Total expenditure £74.20k £79.51k £97.09k £95.04k £85.89k
Income from government contracts £52.20k £85.79k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £63.27k £74.98k £55.95k