Trustees Muskham Preschool
Charity number: 1036670

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SOPHIE MEANWELL | Chair | 09 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Shalena Scrivener | Trustee | 16 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Mollison | Trustee | 04 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Siobhan Pennelegion | Trustee | 27 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kella Lowe | Trustee | 07 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Claire Yeomans | Trustee | 27 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Jenkins | Trustee | 27 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Holly Leonardi | Trustee | 10 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
catherine briggs-price | Trustee | 01 December 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.