Financial history THE RICHARD AND JACK WISEMAN TRUST

Charity number: 1036690
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £48.73k £6.23k £11.34k £56.38k £44.38k
Total expenditure £64.71k £3.61k £551 £80.20k £13.36k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A