Financial history LITTLE NIPPERS PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1036702
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £150.52k £121.94k £155.60k £177.06k £167.78k
Total expenditure £156.57k £123.17k £148.12k £165.65k £178.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A