Financial history ST GABRIELS PLAYGROUP

Charity number: 1036707
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £105.63k £124.00k £83.32k £150.68k £131.23k
Total expenditure £82.15k £93.12k £99.03k £112.31k £130.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £579 N/A N/A N/A