ROTARY CLUB OF CROOK TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1036727

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To apply the capital and income in the relief of the poor and needy or to such other charitable purpose institution society or object.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2023

Total income: £12,156
Total expenditure: £10,938

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity has one or more trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Durham

Governance

Registration history:
  • 20 April 1994: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MariaLuisa Massagli-Gallagher Trustee 17 November 2023
None on record
Neil Carr Trustee 06 November 2023
None on record
John Taylor Trustee 01 July 2022
None on record
DONALD THOMAS TAYLOR FCA Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023
Total gross income £5.80k £4.07k £7.03k £9.93k £12.16k
Total expenditure £5.07k £4.27k £5.55k £9.57k £10.94k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 3 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 3 days
Annual return 30 June 2023 21 June 2024 52 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2022 01 June 2023 32 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 16 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 13 May 2021 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
3 Wordsworth Court
CROOK
DL15 9TP
Phone:
01388764161
Website:

No information available