THE APELT AND LAZARUS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1036728
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

General Charitable Activities

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Total income: £130,677
Total expenditure: £69,594

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • City Of Westminster

Governance

Registration history:
  • 20 April 1994: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • APELT AND LAZARUS CHARITABLE TRUST (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DANIEL ISAAC DOVER Trustee
THE BLUSTON CHARITABLE SETTLEMENT
Received: On time
THE MAURICE WOHL CHARITABLE FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE SCHMIDT-BODNER CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
BDO CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: 14 days late
THE ROSENBLATT FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
DAVID GEORGE KLEEMAN Trustee
THE DAVID KLEEMAN CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
ANDREW TREVOR LAZARUS Trustee
None on record
LEON GERALD LAZARUS Trustee
None on record
BERTA LAZARUS Trustee
None on record
JOHN STEPHEN LAZARUS Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £0 £38.36k £90.00k £30.00k £130.68k
Total expenditure £41.95k £34.22k £33.62k £16.64k £69.59k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 17 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 17 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2023 31 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 31 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2022 01 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 01 November 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 14 March 2022 37 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 14 March 2022 37 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 08 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Flat 6
Embassy Court
45 Wellington Road
LONDON
NW8 9SX
Phone:
02075867295
Website:

No information available