BANSTEAD DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To help provide the resources needed to enable Scout Leaders and administrators to deliver Scouting to as many young people as possible in the District.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £700 from 1 government grant(s)
People

11 Trustee(s)
120 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Surrey
Governance
- 20 April 1994: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
COLIN PAUL GRIFFITHS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Harri Michael Griffiths | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Zachary Luke Pepper | Trustee | 11 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Simon Charles Payne | Trustee | 22 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
richard Salmon | Trustee | 10 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Melissa Louise Vagg | Trustee | 11 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
DAVID SHEPHERD | Trustee | 12 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
KELVIN FREEMAN | Trustee | 12 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
JAN JOBSON | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
DAVID FIELD | Trustee | 15 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
MARK WINGETT | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £76.22k | £46.80k | £39.01k | £44.84k | £29.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £50.56k | £27.92k | £32.98k | £35.82k | £33.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £21.44k | £8.00k | N/A | £700 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 08 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 11 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 17 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 4TH JANUARY 1912
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN ACHIEVING THEIR FULL PHYSICAL INTELLECTUAL SOCIAL AND SPIRITUAL POTENTIALS AS INDIVIDUALS AS RESPONSIBLE CITIZENS AND AS MEMBERS OF THEIR LOCAL NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL COMMUNITIES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED - IN PRACTICE, REIGATE AND BANSTEAD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Park Farm Campsite
Park Farm Drive
BANSTEAD
Surrey
SM7 2FG
- Phone:
- 01737360430
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window