Trustees BANSTEAD DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL
Charity number: 1036740

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
COLIN PAUL GRIFFITHS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Harri Michael Griffiths | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Zachary Luke Pepper | Trustee | 11 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Simon Charles Payne | Trustee | 22 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
richard Salmon | Trustee | 10 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Melissa Louise Vagg | Trustee | 11 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
DAVID SHEPHERD | Trustee | 12 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
KELVIN FREEMAN | Trustee | 12 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
JAN JOBSON | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
DAVID FIELD | Trustee | 15 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
MARK WINGETT | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.