FRIENDS OF THE MEADS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO PROVIDE ACTIVITIES TO BE ENJOYED BY THE LOCAL COMMUNITY WHILST RAISING FUNDS TO BUY EQUIPMENT FOR THE CHILDREN OF THE MEADS SCHOOL IN EAST GRINSTEAD.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- West Sussex
Governance
- 20 April 1994: Standard registration
- FRIENDS OF THE MEADS (Working name)
- THE MEADS PA (EAST GRINSTEAD) (Previous name)
- THE MEADS PTA (Previous name)
- THE MEADS PTA (EAST GRINSTEAD) (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Claire Williams | Trustee | 17 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Katie Batchelor | Trustee | 17 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Georgina Bean | Trustee | 17 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Simon Wigzell | Trustee | 17 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Wigzell | Trustee | 17 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Daniels | Trustee | 27 September 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.14k | £1.25k | £5.20k | £5.36k | £5.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.43k | £657 | £820 | £1.53k | £6.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 25 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 29 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 29 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 15 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24/03/1994 AS AMENDED ON 10/10/2011
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE THE CATCHMENT AREA OF THE SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Meads Primary School
25 Mill Way
East Grinstead
West Sussex
RH19 4DD
- Phone:
- 07515539256
- Email:
- contactfotms@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window