HOKEY COKEY PLAYGROUP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide quality affordable childcare for the local community. This includes nursery education for children aged 3 months to 5 years and wrap-around out of school care for 3months to 5 year olds.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 27 April 1994: Standard registration
- 27 November 2024: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 27 November 2024: Funds transferred to 1146310 KEMP HOSPICE
- THE RAILWAY CHILDREN CHILDCARE CENTRE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2019 | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £230.90k | £205.32k | £187.07k | £131.76k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £261.84k | £202.54k | £213.40k | £31.49k | £1.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £90.90k | £78.67k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £29.78k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 28 October 2024 | 333 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 28 October 2024 | 698 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 28 October 2024 | 698 days late | |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 30 January 2022 | 61 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 30 January 2022 | 61 days late | |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 02 February 2021 | 64 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 January 2020
(These accounts |
02 February 2021 | 64 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSION 2 AUGUST 2016 as amended on 18 Jul 2018 as amended on 18 Jul 2018
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window