THE DRJ CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Makes grants for the wellbeing of disabled people
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Buckinghamshire
- Kent
- Reading
- Slough
- West Berkshire
- Kenya
Governance
- 22 April 1994: Standard registration
- 19 July 2016: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- DRJ CHARITABLE TRUST (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.08k | £6.33k | £6.50k | £6.70k | £3.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.32k | £62.94k | £9.50k | £66.12k | £5.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 29 June 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 28 July 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 25 June 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 31 July 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 31 MARCH 1994
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM A LEARNING DISABILITY OR OTHER HANDICAP EITHER PHYSICAL AND MENTAL. TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY PROVISION OF FINANCIAL AND OTHER SUPPORT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window