PONTELAND LIONS CLUB CHARITY TRUST FUND

Charity Number: 1036820
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The main object of the charity are to raise funds and assist local, national and international charitable purposes.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Total income: £3,107
Total expenditure: £3,272

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Northumberland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 21 April 1994: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Michael Fleet Trustee 10 July 2024
None on record
Peter Earnshaw Trustee 18 April 2023
None on record
Philip Bowe Trustee 18 April 2023
None on record
Damilola Adagbada Trustee 13 April 2023
None on record
Brian Tointon Trustee 18 July 2018
None on record
John Hedley Harvey Trustee 05 April 2017
None on record
Andrew Hislop Anderson Trustee 05 April 2017
PONTELAND METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE WEST METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £3.70k £371 £253 £2.83k £3.11k
Total expenditure £5.14k £1.78k £1.23k £2.23k £3.27k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 09 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2023 25 June 2024 56 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2022 12 May 2023 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 16 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 26 May 2021 26 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
21 RICHMOND WAY
PONTELAND
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE20 9HU
Phone:
01661871844