ABC PRE-SCHOOL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Development and education of children under statutory school age.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Suffolk
Governance
- 22 April 1994: Standard registration
- 19 July 2018: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 19 July 2018: Funds transferred to 1159203 ABC PRESCHOOL
- ABC PRE SCHOOL (Working name)
- STRATFORD ST MARY PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2012 | 31/08/2013 | 31/08/2014 | 31/08/2015 | 31/08/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £79.87k | £46.62k | £57.29k | £65.45k | £70.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £77.04k | £47.00k | £52.28k | £70.16k | £67.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2016 | 29 June 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 August 2016
(These accounts |
29 June 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2015 | 16 June 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2015 | 16 June 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2014 | 28 June 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2014 | 28 June 2015 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
Scheme dated 22 May 2015
Charitable objects
The aims of the Pre-school are to enhance the development and education of children primarily under statutory school age by encouraging parents to understand and provide for the needs of their children through community groups and by: (a) offering appropriate play, education and care facilities, family learning and extended hours groups, together with the right of parents to take responsibility for and to become involved in the activities of such groups, ensuring that such groups offer opportunities for all children whatever their race, culture, religion, means or ability; (b) encouraging the study of the needs of such children and their families and promoting public interest in and recognition of such needs in the local areas; (c) Instigating and adhering to and furthering the aims and objects of the Pre-school Learning Alliance.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window