Accounts and annual returns FOREST FRIENDS NURSERY GROUP

Charity number: 1036860
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 April 2012 09 February 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 April 2012 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2011 31 October 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2011 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2010 02 February 2011 36 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2010 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2009 20 August 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2009 Not Required