Financial history FOREST FRIENDS NURSERY GROUP

Charity number: 1036860
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2008 28/02/2009 28/02/2010 28/02/2011 28/04/2012
Total gross income £7.05k £4.01k £2.00k £2.35k £606
Total expenditure £7.85k £4.47k £2.49k £3.12k £2.19k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A