Accounts and annual returns RED SQUIRRELS NURSERY

Charity Number: 1036866
Charity reporting is up to date (144 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 19 September 2024 111 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 22 October 2024 144 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2022 01 July 2023 31 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 01 July 2023 31 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 29 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 29 March 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 17 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 17 March 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2019 22 July 2020 52 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 22 July 2020 52 days late Download Open in new window