Financial history RED SQUIRRELS NURSERY

Charity Number: 1036866
Charity reporting is up to date (144 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Total gross income £30.44k £34.90k £39.71k £66.20k £74.04k
Total expenditure £33.03k £24.96k £30.64k £52.83k £67.75k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A £52.11k £52.82k