Trustees THE ANNE DYER FOUNDATION
Charity number: 1036877

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JACQUELINE MARY BARR | Chair | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Janet Margery Heaney | Trustee | 25 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Trevor John Leese | Trustee | 16 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anne Gooding | Trustee | 07 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Anne Winifred Swinnerton Dyer MBE | Trustee | 04 November 2019 |
|
|||||
ROLAND JONATHAN IRAN MORRIS | Trustee | 21 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
JULIE HEDGES | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.