Financial history TERRINGTON ST CLEMENT PRIMARY SCHOOL FRIENDS OF THE SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1036881
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £4.81k £584 £5.40k £12.49k £10.22k
Total expenditure £3.83k £1.26k £5.90k £6.69k £6.82k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A