TERRINGTON ST CLEMENT PRIMARY SCHOOL FRIENDS OF THE SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our purpose is to raise funds for the school to provide extra equipment and facilities which are not provided by the Local Education Authority. All of the funds raised by us are raised through activities such as school discos which take place every term, Christmas and Summer Fairs, Non-uniform Days, Quiz Nights, Sponsored Events and much more.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Norfolk
Governance
- 22 April 1994: Standard registration
- F O S A (Working name)
- F O S A TERRINGTON ST CLEMENT COMMUNITY SCHOOL (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Katherine Whitmore | Chair | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Joanne CHISAM | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Connor | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
HEIDI HOLLINGTON | Trustee | 19 September 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.81k | £584 | £5.40k | £12.49k | £10.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.83k | £1.26k | £5.90k | £6.69k | £6.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 27 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 14 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 26 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 2 MARCH 1994
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE THE CATCHMENT AREA OF THE SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
72 Churchgate Way
Terrington St Clement
King's Lynn
Norfolk
PE34 4JR
- Phone:
- 01553 828348
- Email:
- fosa.tsccs@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window