Financial history BURMA COURT PLAYGROUP

Charity Number: 1036944
Charity reporting is up to date (6 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £133.08k £93.83k £106.80k £130.11k £126.73k
Total expenditure £112.26k £124.44k £99.98k £117.60k £123.79k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £67.94k N/A N/A N/A N/A