Accounts and annual returns YORKSHIRE AND HUMBERSIDE PLAY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1036970
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 20 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 06 September 2024 219 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 11 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 23 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 04 February 2021 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required