IPSWICH COUNTY COURT ADVICE AND REPRESENTATION SERVICE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2004
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Suffolk
Governance
- 27 April 1994: Standard registration
- 22 July 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
- I C C A R S (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £446 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1 MARCH 1994
Charitable objects
I)TO FACILITATE STUDY AND RESEARCH AS THE COMMITTEE CONSIDER NECESSARY INTO THE NEED FOR SERVICES OFFERING ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE IN SUFFOLK AND TO PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS OF ALL SUCH STUDY AND RESEARCH II)TO ASSIST PERSONS IN FINANCIAL AND RESIDENT OR WORKING WITHIN SUFFOLK BY PROVIDING SUCH PERSONS WITH ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE WHICH THEY COULD NOT OTHERWISE OBTAIN
Area of benefit
SUFFOLK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window