Trustees NORTH HYKEHAM WAR MEMORIAL HALL AND PLAYING FIELDS TRUST
Charity Number: 1037017

Charity reporting is overdue by 107 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
AMANDA BOUTTELL | Chair | 14 January 2015 |
|
|||||
Paul Wray | Trustee | 15 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rick Waite | Trustee | 25 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dave Wilkinson | Trustee | 16 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alex Cruickshanks | Trustee | 13 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Roe | Trustee | 10 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Burnley | Trustee | 10 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Roy Jones | Trustee | 08 August 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.