Accounts and annual returns BEN'S FRIENDS TRUST

Charity number: 1037040
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 30 June 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 30 June 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2006 Not submitted
Annual return 30 June 2005 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2005 Not submitted
Annual return 30 June 2004 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2004 Not submitted