CHIDHAM & HAMBROOK VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Maintenance and hire of Chidham & Hambrook Village Hall. Chidham & Hambrook Film Society Events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- West Sussex
Governance
- 28 April 1994: Standard registration
- CHIDHAM VILLAGE HALL (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mr Steve Tanner | Chair | 01 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr Anthony John Kerr | Trustee | 31 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr COLIN STANLEY TURTON | Trustee | 31 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen Stevens | Trustee | 26 October 2022 |
|
|||||
LOIS VICTORIA KNIGHT | Trustee | 27 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
MICHELE DENISE CHAPMAN-ANDREWS | Trustee | 21 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
STEVEN BIRCH | Trustee | 26 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Valmai Anne Rustell | Trustee | 28 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr JACQUELINE ANNE SHEPPARD | Trustee | 06 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
JOHN WINGROVE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID RODGERS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JANE TOWERS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.53k | £10.68k | £12.44k | £13.77k | £14 | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.13k | £16.19k | £13.35k | £10.74k | £11 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.41k | £8.25k | £2.67k | £543 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 13 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 20 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 09 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 06 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 18/06/1932 AS AMENDED ON 20/03/2009
Charitable objects
A NON SECTARIAN AND NON POLITICAL PLACE OF RECREATION FOR THE PUBLIC CHARITABLE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF CHIDHAM AND THE ADJOINING PARISH
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE CHIDHAM AND THE ADJOINING PARISH
Contact information
- Address:
-
Blue Hayes
Main Road
Nutbourne
Chichester
PO18 8RN
- Phone:
- 01243573467
- Email:
- JACKYSHEPPARD3@GMAIL.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window