THE JERICHO FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To seek out and engage those who experience the greatest barriers To help our clients gain relevant vocational skills To help clients to overcome their personal barriers and become fulfilled individuals To provide real work experience for our clients To help clients gain sustainable employment To develop and run successful social enterprise businesses To be good stewards of the environment
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£2,141,057
Donations and legacies | £859.99k | |
Charitable activities | £1.28m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£2,140,756
Raising funds | £102.81k | |
Charitable activities | £2.04m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £39,163 from 1 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £102.81k | |
Charitable expenditure | £2.04m | |
Retained for future use | £301 |
People

97 Employee(s)
6 Trustee(s)
29 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 28 April 1994: Standard registration
- THE JERICHO FOUNDATION (Working name)
- THE JERICHO COMMUNITY PROJECT (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Colin Marsh | Chair | 21 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Martin Graham Robertson | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
David James Thomas Wickens | Trustee | 21 July 2022 |
|
|||||
James Jayson Crystal | Trustee | 21 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Uniqua Brown | Trustee | 21 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Zac Dixon | Trustee | 19 July 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.70m | £1.83m | £1.91m | £2.31m | £2.14m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.66m | £1.59m | £1.83m | £2.24m | £2.14m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £404.82k | N/A | N/A | £39.16k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £631.58k | £1.03m | £761.99k | £966.54k | £859.99k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £1.07m | £800.01k | £1.15m | £1.35m | £1.28m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.59m | £1.53m | £1.75m | £2.16m | £2.04m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £65.60k | £59.87k | £80.77k | £87.07k | £102.81k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £0 | £48.55k | £87.23k | £56.01k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £557.35k | £1.09m | £588.93k | £653.36k | £1.32m | |
|
Long-term investments | £610.00k | £60.00k | £660.38k | £750.00k | £74.00k | |
|
Other assets | £490.49k | £663.42k | £714.19k | £572.46k | £499.29k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £1.14m | £1.05m | £1.12m | £1.07m | £986.46k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 18 AUGUST 1993 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 2 FEBRUARY 1994 AND 13 MARCH 2007 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 22 OCT 2020 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 16 DEC 2020 as amended on 24 Dec 2020
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS (‘OBJECTS’) ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN THE CITY OF BIRMINGHAM AND ELSEWHERE: I. TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED, HARDSHIP, DISTRESS OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE DUE TO YOUTH, AGE, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, POVERTY, ILLNESS, DISABILITY OR HOMELESSNESS. II. TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE ‘SOCIALLY EXCLUDED’ MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF ONE OF MORE OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS: UNEMPLOYMENT; FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; YOUTH OR OLD AGE; ILL HEALTH (PHYSICAL OR MENTAL); SUBSTANCE ABUSE OR DEPENDENCY INCLUDING ALCOHOL AND DRUGS; POOR EDUCATIONAL OR SKILLS ATTAINMENT; RELATIONSHIP AND FAMILY BREAKDOWN; POOR HOUSING; CRIME (EITHER AS A VICTIM OF CRIME OR AS AN OFFENDER REHABILITATING INTO SOCIETY). III. THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN SUCH WAYS AS MAY BE THOUGHT FIT, INCLUDING ASSISTANCE TO FIND EMPLOYMENT. IV. TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS OF THE SAID CITY. V. TO PURSUE ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE WHICH THE CHARITY THINKS FIT FOR PURSUIT IN CONJUNCTION WITH ANY OF THE CHARITABLE PURPOSES AFORESAID WHICH ARE PURSUED OUT UNDER A CHRISTIAN ETHOS
Area of benefit
BIRMINGHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
JERICHO FOUNDATION
JERICHO BUILDING
196-198 EDWARD ROAD
BALSALL HEATH
BIRMINGHAM
B12 9LX
- Phone:
- 01216471960
- Email:
- enquiries@jericho.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window