ROTARY CLUB OF ROBOROUGH CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Several fund raising events during the year, including a Christmas sleigh collection. The club is supported by the Inner Wheel Club of Roborough. For the relief of the poor and needy and to or for such other charitable purposes etc, as the Roborough Rotary Club shall deem from time to time.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Cornwall
- Devon
Governance
- 29 April 1994: Standard registration
- Rotary Club of Plymouth Roborough Charitable Trust (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darren Hands | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|||||
Peter Noakes | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susan Aston | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Graham Hayman | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.43k | £6.90k | £10.96k | £10.41k | £9.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.29k | £4.41k | £11.50k | £7.73k | £12.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 21 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 25 June 2024 | 56 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 07 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 02 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 11 May 2021 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 22 MARCH 1994
Charitable objects
RELIEF OF THE POOR AND NEEDY OR TO OR FOR SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE INSTITUTION SOCIETY
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Whistle-stop Cottage
35 Colesdown Hill
PLYMOUTH
PL9 8AQ
- Phone:
- 01752 562872
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window