Governing document EALING LIBERAL SYNAGOGUE

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14 MAY 1989 AS AMENDED ON 09 JUN 1996 AS AMENDED ON 05 JUN 2011 AS AMENDED ON 23 SEP 2019 AS AMENDED ON 19 OCT 2020 AS AMENDED ON 15 NOV 2020
Charitable objects
15. AFFILIATION. THE CONGREGATION IS AFFILIATED TO THE UNION OF LIBERAL AND PROGRESSIVE SYNAGOGUES AND SHALL PAY SUCH ANNUAL FEE(S) AS MAY BE DETERMINED BY THE SAID UNION. 16 . OBJECTS. THE OBJECTS OF THE CONGREGATION SHALL BE:- (A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF LIBERAL JUDAISM; (B) TO PROVIDE, ARRANGE AND CONDUCT RELIGIOUS SERVICES FOR THE MEMBERS OF THE CONGREGATION IN SUCH FORM AND MANNER AND AT SUCH TIMES AND PLACES AS SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETCIDED BY THE COUNCIL.; (C) TO PROVIDE, MAINTAIN, AND CARRY ON A PLACE OF WORSHIP; (D) TO PROVIDE, ARRANGE AND CONDUCT IN CONFORMITY WITH THE RELIGIOUS SERVICES AS AFORESAID, CLASSES AND SERVICES FOR CHILDREN; (E) TO ARRANGE FACILITIES FOR THE BURIAL OR CREMATION OF MEMBERS; (F) TO DO ALL THINGS NECESSARY TO ENABLE MARRIAGES TO BE SOLEMNISED; (G) TO PERFORM SUCH OTHER RELIGIOUS, COMMUNAL AND/OR CHARITABLE DUTIES AS THE COUNCIL SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE; (H) TO DO ALL SUCH OTHER ACTS AND THINGS AS THE COUNCIL SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DEEM TO BE CONDUCIVE TO THE AFORESAID OBJECTS, AND IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT SO AS IN ANY WAY TO LIMIT THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING PART OF THIS CLAUSE, TO RAISE, BORROW AND SECURE THE PAYMENT OF ANY SUM OR SUMS OF MONEY, AND TO PURCHASE, TAKE ON LEASE OR AGREEMENT, AND HIRE ANY LAND OR INTEREST THEREIN, OR ANY PROPERTY OF ANY KIND, AND TO SELL, MORTGAGE, CHARGE, GRANT LEASES OR AGREEMENTS IN RESPECT OF AND IN ANY OTHER MANNER DEAL WITH OR TURN TO ACCOUNT ANY LAND OR INTEREST THEREIN OR ANY OTHER PROPERTY OF ANY KIND BELONGING TO THE CONGREGATION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.