Financial history THE FRIENDS OF ALL SAINTS PERPETUAL FABRIC FUND

Charity number: 1037103
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £5.26k £4.29k £4.39k £5.04k £3.84k
Total expenditure £3.44k £4.05k £5.29k £4.50k £3.77k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A