THE KENILWORTH SENIOR CITIZENS' CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Social gatherings including weekly whist ,keep fit and bingo sessions. Lunches and coffee mornings. All held in the Clubhouse at Abbey End, Kenilworth. Summer and winter holidays and day outings.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 December 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 28 April 1994: Standard registration
- KENILWORTH SENIOR CITIZENS CLUB (Working name)
- THE KENILWORTH OLD FOLKS CLUB (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LINDA C V PARKER | Chair | 05 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
Richard Hodge | Trustee | 13 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Linda Baker | Trustee | 13 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Susan Lesley Maher | Trustee | 13 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Diane Watson | Trustee | 13 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Brown | Trustee | 25 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carol Millward | Trustee | 23 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Harrison | Trustee | 23 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Freda Britton | Trustee | 23 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lillian Thompson | Trustee | 23 February 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/12/2020 | 30/12/2021 | 30/12/2022 | 30/12/2023 | 30/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.20k | £3.50k | £12.41k | £12.97k | £16.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.82k | £8.23k | £12.97k | £10.90k | £18.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 December 2024 | 14 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 December 2023 | 26 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 December 2022 | 16 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 December 2021 | 10 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 December 2020 | 22 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24/02/1994 AS AMENDED ON 04/03/2004 AS AMENDED ON 27/02/2014
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF ELDERLY PEOPLE IN ANY MANNER DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE WITHIN THE TOWN OF KENILWORTH AND NEIGHBOURING AREAS
Area of benefit
KENILWORTH
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 2 coniston grange
11 Priory road
Kenilworth CV8 1LL
CV8 1ll
- Phone:
- 07493314826
- Email:
- patspain@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window