CARNMENELLIS WOMENS INSTITUTE

Charity number: 1037144
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

WI Monthly meetings Talks etc.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 January 2008

Total income: £1,361
Total expenditure: £1,401

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Cornwall

Governance

Registration history:
  • 13 May 1994: Standard registration
  • 18 March 2009: Removed (Voluntary removal)
Organisation type:
Other names:
  • CARNMENELLIS WI (Working name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2004 31/01/2005 31/01/2006 31/01/2007 31/01/2008
Total gross income £1.31k £768 £879 £515 £1.36k
Total expenditure £959 £1.25k £1.01k £621 £1.40k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2008 05 November 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2008 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2007 03 August 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2006 11 July 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2005 16 September 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2005 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2004 25 August 2004 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2004 Not Required