THUNDERSLEY VILLAGE WOMEN'S INSTITUTE
Charity Number: 1037147
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 October 2008
Total income: £1,242
Total expenditure: £1,407
Fundraising
No information available
Trading
No information available
Trustee payments
No information available
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
No information available
How the charity helps:
- Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
- Essex
Governance
Registration history:
- 05 May 1994: Standard registration
- 19 May 2009: Removed (Voluntary removal)
Organisation type:
Other names:
- THUNDERSLEY VILLAGE WI (Working name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/10/2004 | 30/10/2005 | 30/10/2006 | 30/11/2007 | 30/10/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.29k | £1.32k | £1.68k | £1.21k | £1.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.41k | £1.31k | £1.60k | £1.24k | £1.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 October 2008 | 28 January 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2008 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2007 | 04 September 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 October 2006 | 11 June 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2006 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 October 2005 | 31 July 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2005 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 October 2004 | 24 June 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2004 | Not Required |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MODEL CONSTITUTION AND RULES (ALREADY LODGED)
Charitable objects
TO ENABLE WOMEN TO TAKE AN EFFECTIVE PART IN RURAL LIFE AND DEVELOPMENT.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
THUNDERSLEY
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window