Financial history KENSINGTON PREP SCHOOL PARENTS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1037150
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £32.94k £9.29k £20.15k £65.12k £61.96k
Total expenditure £7.52k £23.74k £22.15k £87.95k £72.51k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A