FRIENDS OF GRUNDISBURGH SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1037165
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

A variety of fundraising events such as School Fair, Quiz Night, Summer Sports Day Party, Bingo Afternoon, Raffles, Cake Sales and other events to raise funds for the benefit of Grundisburgh Primary School pupils.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £6,184
Total expenditure: £5,211

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Suffolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 12 May 1994: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • FOGS (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Lucy Shemmings Chair 29 October 2019
None on record
Sally Mitchell Trustee 01 February 2024
None on record
Kristy White Trustee 15 September 2022
None on record
Adam Graham Wilson Trustee 15 September 2022
None on record
Sarah Ann Cavanagh Trustee 08 February 2022
None on record
Caroline Warren Trustee 20 September 2021
1ST GRUNDISBURGH SCOUT GROUP
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £11.45k £7.65k £7.04k £7.20k £6.18k
Total expenditure £6.96k £11.12k £9.79k £5.99k £5.21k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 30 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 26 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 12 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 14 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 02 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
GRUNDISBURGH PRIMARY SCHOOL
ALICE DRIVER ROAD
GRUNDISBURGH
WOODBRIDGE
IP13 6XH
Phone:
01473 735281