Financial history R M B I FRIENDS OF THE ALBERT EDWARD PRINCE OF WALES COURT

Charity Number: 1037175
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £42.13k £31.05k £17.86k £22.27k £28.91k
Total expenditure £46.98k £22.82k £32.01k £9.77k £29.38k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A