EAST BOROUGH PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1037204
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

VARIOUS FUNDRAISING ACTIVITIES

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £21,586
Total expenditure: £32,504

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Kent

Governance

Registration history:
  • 03 May 1994: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • EAST BOROUGH COUNTY PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Charlotte McClymont Mrs Trustee 23 July 2015
None on record
Yun Mai Gillam Trustee 23 July 2015
None on record
JANET HERBERT Trustee 11 May 2011
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £20.57k £11.52k £4.73k £24.67k £21.59k
Total expenditure £24.97k £11.67k £5.47k £15.73k £32.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 30 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 15 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 25 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 16 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 08 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
East Borough Primary School
Vinters Road
MAIDSTONE
Kent
ME14 5DX
Phone:
01622 754633
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available