Financial history FRIENDS OF HINGHAM SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1037206
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023 31/01/2024
Total gross income £10.00k £3.87k £1.92k £12.38k £15.41k
Total expenditure £13.08k £4.34k £6.05k £8.04k £18.01k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A