Accounts and annual returns PENTWYNMAWR PIXIES

Charity Number: 1037212
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2014 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2012 20 March 2013 48 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2011 27 October 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 Not Required