YEALMPTON PRE-SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a Pre-school in Yealmpton and offer places to children aged from 2 to 5 years old. Yealmpton Pre-school also holds a parent and child playgroup on a tuesday morning for children aged between birth and 5 years for more details call 01752 881810
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Devon
Governance
- 03 May 1994: Standard registration
- ACORNS STAY AND PLAY CLUB (Working name)
- YEALMPTON PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rosie Elliott | Trustee | 09 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Cassie O'Neill | Trustee | 09 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Laura Farleigh | Trustee | 18 May 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £59.60k | £67.27k | £72.20k | £92.82k | £125.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £65.22k | £65.62k | £69.61k | £84.29k | £94.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 27 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 27 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 17 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 17 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 02 October 2023 | 94 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 02 October 2023 | 94 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 02 October 2023 | 459 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 02 October 2023 | 459 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 30 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 04 February 2022 | 219 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22 SEPTEMBER 1987 AS AMENDED 10 OCTOBER 1995 AND 14 OCTOBER 2010
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
COMMUNITY & RESOURCE CENTRE
STRAY PARK
YEALMPTON
PLYMOUTH
PL8 2HF
- Phone:
- 01752881810
- Email:
- yealmptonpreschool@ymail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window