MAIDENHEAD MUSIC AND DANCE FESTIVAL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1037220
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Plans, organises and runs annual festival of music, dance and speech, as affiliated to the British and International Federation of Festivals of Music, Dance and Speech

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £18,267
Total expenditure: £14,034

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Buckinghamshire
  • Reading
  • Slough
  • Surrey
  • Windsor And Maidenhead

Governance

Registration history:
  • 03 May 1994: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • MAIDENHEAD FESTIVAL OF MUSIC AND DANCE (Working name)
  • MAIDENHEAD FESTIVAL OF MUSIC DANCE AND SPEECH (Working name)
  • MAIDENHEAD MUSIC FESTIVAL (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Matej Lehocky Chair 12 October 2022
None on record
Rosalind Annette Hazeldine Trustee 23 April 2024
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. JOHN THE BAPTIST COOKHAM DEAN
Received: On time
Julia Bentley-Dawkes Trustee 05 April 2018
CHILTERN MUSIC ACADEMY
Received: On time
Kirsty Janusz Trustee 05 April 2018
None on record
Victoria Dawkes Trustee 05 April 2018
None on record
Andrew Michael Eden Trustee 13 January 2015
None on record
JANET VICTORIA MARTIN Trustee 01 October 2013
None on record
HILARY JANE HENNESSEY Trustee
None on record
ROGER DAVID WITNEY Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £17.87k £6 £6.16k £9.22k £18.27k
Total expenditure £17.38k £375 £4.61k £8.72k £14.03k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 16 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 29 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 17 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 19 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 10 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
EDELWYN
DEAN LANE
COOKHAM Dean
Maidenhead
SL6 9AG
Phone:
07803417616
Website:

maidenheadfestival.co.uk