TIBET HOUSE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
During the financial year the Trust had made donations to charitable institutions amounting to ?219,347. The detailed are below: 1) Education, Religion and Culture - ? 26,597 2) Community Development - ? 178,784 3) Health - ? 13,966
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout London
- India
- Nepal
Governance
- 06 May 1994: Standard registration
- THT (Working name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Phuntsok Phuntsok | Trustee | 20 November 2024 |
|
|||||
Tsering Yangkey | Trustee | 06 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
HANSJORG MICHAEL MAYER | Trustee | 18 January 2012 |
|
|||||
VISCOUNT MICHAEL COWDRAY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £135.51k | £251.14k | £191.14k | £780.32k | £145.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £668.74k | £281.46k | £326.61k | £128.02k | £688.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £779.00k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.31k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £128.02k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £13.71k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £51.17k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 February 2025 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 07 February 2025 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 February 2024 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 08 February 2024 | 8 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 28 FEBRUARY 1994 AS AMENDED ON 20TH NOVEMBER 1995
Charitable objects
A) TO ADVANCE TIBETAN BUDDHISM PARTICULARLY BY MAKING WIDELY AVAILABLE THE WORKS AND TEACHINGS OF HIS HOLINESS THE 14TH DALAI LAMA OF TIBET B) TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC BY PROMOTING A GREATER AWARENESS OF THE CULTURE,RELIGION AND WAY OF LIFE OF THE TIBETAN PEOPLE INCLUDING TIBETAN TRADITIONAL MEDICINE,ASTROLOGY,LANGUAGE AND LITERATURE,LOGIC,PHILOSOPHY,THEATRE,SACRED DANCE,MUSIC AND CRAFTS C) TO RELIEVE THE POVERTY OF PEOPLE OF TIBETAN ORIGIN AND ATTEND TO THE IMPOVERISHED PARTS OF THE TIBETAN COMMUNITY,PARTICULARLY BUT EXCLUSIVELY,IN INDIA AND NEPAL
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Office of Tibet
1 Culworth Street
London
NW8 7AF
- Phone:
- 02077225378
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window