Accounts and annual returns Farmborough Pre-school

Charity number: 1037250
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2024 23 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2024 23 February 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2023 07 June 2024 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 07 June 2024 7 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2022 10 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 10 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 08 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 08 April 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 25 June 2021 25 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 25 June 2021 25 days late Download Open in new window