Financial history Farmborough Pre-school

Charity number: 1037250
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £72.76k £72.59k £73.04k £81.21k £82.84k
Total expenditure £59.00k £62.31k £64.53k £71.65k £78.30k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £550 £400 N/A £994 N/A