DEEPDALE COMMUNITY PRE-SCHOOL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Offers outstanding flexible care for children from 2 years of age. We offer sessional term time places from monday to friday.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Leeds City
Governance
- 05 May 1994: Standard registration
- 03 September 2019: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- DEEPDALE COMMUNITY PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2013 | 31/08/2014 | 31/08/2015 | 31/08/2016 | 31/08/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £86.00k | £118.94k | £101.44k | £113.90k | £119.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £102.00k | £110.55k | £108.40k | £114.69k | £127.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £74.32k | £81.33k | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2017 | 26 June 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 August 2017
(These accounts |
26 June 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2016 | 29 June 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 August 2016
(These accounts |
29 June 2017 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17 MAY 1993.AS AMENDED 7TH SEPTEMBER 1995.
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window