SANDRINGHAM ESTATE COTTAGE HORTICULTURAL SOCIETY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The promotion of horticulture and floriculture by the holding of an annual show on the Sandringham Estate for the benefit of the public for the exhibition of flowers, fruit and vegetables and by such other means as the Trustees may from time to time think fit, and to distribute to charities, chosen annually by the Society, all funds held by the Society that are surplus to requirements.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Norfolk
Governance
- 05 May 1994: Standard registration
- SANDRINGHAM FLOWER SHOW (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mary Ann Watts | Trustee | 30 August 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
Amanda Jane Browne | Trustee | 07 December 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Jack Raymond Lindfield | Trustee | 15 October 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Revd Canon Dr Paul Rhys Williams | Trustee | 15 October 2022 |
|
|||||||||||
Edward Parsons | Trustee | 01 August 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £231.39k | £1.44k | £392 | £294.68k | £312.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £229.82k | £38.18k | £2.72k | £255.18k | £271.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 19 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 14 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 14 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 10 MARCH 1994
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF HORTICULTURE AND FLORICULTURE BY THE HOLDING OF AN ANNUAL SHOW IN THE COTTAGE AND OTHER GARDENS ON THE SANDRINGHAM ESTATE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC FOR THE EXHIBITION OF FLOWERS,FRUIT AND VEGETABLES AND BY SUCH OTHER MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT,AND TO DISTRIBUTE TO CHARITIES,CHOSEN ANNUALLY BY THE SOCIETY,ALL FUNDS HELD BY THE SOCIETY THAT ARE SURPLUS TO REQUIREMENTS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 Ibstock Close
Tydd St. Mary
WISBECH
Cambridgeshire
PE13 5RN
- Phone:
- 01945 420610
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window